IA SF440 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 823.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 823.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to court reporters, including the reporting of adoption hearings and uncertified shorthand reporter appointments.(Formerly SSB 1107.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to court reporters, including the reporting of adoption hearings and uncertified shorthand reporter appointments.(Formerly SSB 1107.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 823. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | HF 433 substituted. S.J. 822. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 433. S.J. 476. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 447. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 442. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB78 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 300.
SSB1107 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 440.
HF433 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SSB1107 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 440.
HF433 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.