IA SSB1102 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF432
Note: Legislation replaced by SF343
Note: Legislation replaced by SF343
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 343.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 343.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to authorized access to certain confidential records by employees of the department of corrections, a judicial district department of correctional services, and the board of parole.(See SF 343.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to authorized access to certain confidential records by employees of the department of corrections, a judicial district department of correctional services, and the board of parole.(See SF 343.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 343. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2021 10:00AM RM 24A. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Bisignano, and Reichman. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB87 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 300.
HF432 (Replaced by) 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 466.
SF343 (Replaced by) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 555.
HF432 (Replaced by) 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 466.
SF343 (Replaced by) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 555.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1102 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1102.html |