IA HF432 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to authorized access to certain confidential records by employees of the department of corrections, a judicial district department of correctional services, and the board of parole.(Formerly HSB 87.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to authorized access to certain confidential records by employees of the department of corrections, a judicial district department of correctional services, and the board of parole.(Formerly HSB 87.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 466. |
2021-02-17 | House | SF 343 substituted. H.J. 459. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 309. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB87 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 300.
SSB1102 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 343.
SF343 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 555.
SSB1102 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 343.
SF343 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 555.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF432 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF432.html |