IA SSB1031 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF159
Note: Legislation replaced by HF513
Note: Legislation replaced by HF513
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2019 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2019 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to assessment scores set by the department of education for successful completion of a practitioner preparation program and for initial teacher licensure and providing for related matters.
Title
A bill for an act relating to assessment scores set by the department of education for successful completion of a practitioner preparation program and for initial teacher licensure and providing for related matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2019 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Lofgren, and Quirmbach. S.J. 126. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB17 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 346.
SF159 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 981.
HF513 (Replaced by) 2019-04-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 704.
SF159 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 981.
HF513 (Replaced by) 2019-04-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 704.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1031 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1031.html |