IA HSB17 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF159
Note: Legislation replaced by HF513
Note: Legislation replaced by HF513
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to assessment scores set by the department of education for successful completion of a practitioner preparation program and for initial teacher licensure and providing for related matters.
Title
A bill for an act relating to assessment scores set by the department of education for successful completion of a practitioner preparation program and for initial teacher licensure and providing for related matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 346. |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2019 9:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Kerr and R. Smith. H.J. 130. |
2019-01-22 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1031 (Related) 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2019 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
SF159 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 981.
HF513 (Replaced by) 2019-04-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 704.
SF159 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 981.
HF513 (Replaced by) 2019-04-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 704.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB17 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB17.html |