IA SF90 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 265. S.J. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 265. S.J. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to temporary parental discretion for the retention of a student at grade level.(See SF 265.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to temporary parental discretion for the retention of a student at grade level.(See SF 265.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 265. S.J. 264. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, J. Smith, and J. Taylor. S.J. 141. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 118. |
Same As/Similar To
SF265 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1203.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF90 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF90.html |