IA SF265 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to temporary parental discretion for the retention of a student at grade level.(Formerly SF 90.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to temporary parental discretion for the retention of a student at grade level.(Formerly SF 90.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1203. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 919. |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 873. |
2021-03-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2021-03-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2021-03-16 | House | Subcommittee: Wheeler, Salmon and Staed. H.J. 738. |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 554. |
2021-02-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 528. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 427. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 43, nays 5. S.J. 427. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 264. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 261. |
Same As/Similar To
SF90 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 265. S.J. 264.