IA SF623 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the process and fees associated with the registration and title of vessels, snowmobiles, and all-terrain vehicles. (Formerly SSB 1122, SF 281.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the process and fees associated with the registration and title of vessels, snowmobiles, and all-terrain vehicles. (Formerly SSB 1122, SF 281.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1019. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | HF 389 substituted. S.J. 1018. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 389. S.J. 963. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 948. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 946. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB44 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 292.
SSB1122 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF389 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.
SF281 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 623. S.J. 948.
SSB1122 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF389 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.
SF281 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 623. S.J. 948.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF623 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF623.html |