IA SF281 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 623. S.J. 948.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 623. S.J. 948.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the process and fees associated with the registration and title of vessels, snowmobiles, and all-terrain vehicles. (Formerly SSB 1122; See SF 623.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the process and fees associated with the registration and title of vessels, snowmobiles, and all-terrain vehicles. (Formerly SSB 1122; See SF 623.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 623. S.J. 948. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Sweeney, Behn, and Giddens. S.J. 848. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Behn, and J. Smith. S.J. 546. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 514. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 332. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 325. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB44 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 292.
SSB1122 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF389 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.
SF623 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1019.
SSB1122 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF389 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.
SF623 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1019.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF281 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF281.html |