IA SF618 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Dawson, and Dotzler. S.J. 120.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Dawson, and Dotzler. S.J. 120.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to investment tax credits and innovation fund tax credits, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1196.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to investment tax credits and innovation fund tax credits, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1196.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Dawson, and Dotzler. S.J. 120. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1148. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1022. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 1021. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1196 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 618.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF618 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF618.html |