IA SSB1196 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF618
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 618.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 618.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to investment tax credits and innovation fund tax credits, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 618.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to investment tax credits and innovation fund tax credits, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 618.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 618. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Dawson, Dotzler, and Goodwin. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 10:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Dotzler, and Goodwin. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SF618 (Replaced by) 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Dawson, and Dotzler. S.J. 120.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1196 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1196.html |