IA SF576 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee reassigned: Fry, Best and Wilburn. H.J. 80.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee reassigned: Fry, Best and Wilburn. H.J. 80.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the protection of certain patient information and data under the purview of the department of public health. (Formerly SSB 1228.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the protection of certain patient information and data under the purview of the department of public health. (Formerly SSB 1228.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Fry, Best and Wilburn. H.J. 80. |
2019-03-26 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Best and Heddens. H.J. 653. |
2019-03-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2019 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 621. |
2019-03-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 617. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 707. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 34, nays 13. S.J. 706. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 529. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 519. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1228 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.