IA SF57 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 591. S.J. 546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 591. S.J. 546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the mistreatment of certain animals other than livestock and wildlife, by providing for criminal offenses, including penalties. (See SF 591.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the mistreatment of certain animals other than livestock and wildlife, by providing for criminal offenses, including penalties. (See SF 591.)
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Shipley [R] | Sen. Dan Dawson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 591. S.J. 546. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Kinney, and Shipley. S.J. 146. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 107. |
Same As/Similar To
SF591 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee: Brown, Kinney, and Zumbach. S.J. 69.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF57 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF57.html |