IA SF591 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee: Brown, Kinney, and Zumbach. S.J. 69.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee: Brown, Kinney, and Zumbach. S.J. 69.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the mistreatment of certain animals other than livestock and wildlife, by providing for criminal offenses, and including penalties. (Formerly SF 57.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the mistreatment of certain animals other than livestock and wildlife, by providing for criminal offenses, and including penalties. (Formerly SF 57.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Kinney, and Zumbach. S.J. 69. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture. S.J. 859. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Fiscal note, revised. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 546. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 545. |
Same As/Similar To
SF57 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 591. S.J. 546.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF591 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF591.html |