IA SF563 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefit managers and information related to the management of prescription drug benefits, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 347.) Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefit managers and information related to the management of prescription drug benefits, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 347.) Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 1196.
2019-05-03HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193.
2019-04-18HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 902.
2019-04-17SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1001.
2019-04-17SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1001.
2019-04-17SenateSenate concurred with S-3169. S.J. 1000.
2019-04-17SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3169. S.J. 984.
2019-04-16HouseImmediate message. H.J. 883.
2019-04-16HousePassed House, yeas 100 nays none. H.J. 865.
2019-04-16HouseAmendment H-1215 adopted. H.J. 865.
2019-04-16HouseSubstituted for HF 489. H.J. 865.
2019-04-16HouseFiscal note.
2019-04-15HouseAmendment H-1215 filed. H.J. 859.
2019-04-10HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 810.
2019-04-10HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 810.
2019-04-10SenateImmediate message. S.J. 925.
2019-04-10SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 923.
2019-04-10SenateAmendment S-3153 filed, adopted. S.J. 923.
2019-04-10SenateAmendment S-3148 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 923.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857.
2019-04-01SenateFiscal note.
2019-03-11SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 524.
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 517.

Same As/Similar To

SF347 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 563. S.J. 524.
HF489 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback