IA SF347 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 563. S.J. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 563. S.J. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefit managers and health carriers and management of prescription drug benefits, and including applicability provisions. (See SF 563.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefit managers and health carriers and management of prescription drug benefits, and including applicability provisions. (See SF 563.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 563. S.J. 524. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Miller-Meeks, Greene, and Mathis. S.J. 406. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 375. |
Same As/Similar To
HF489 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.
SF563 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
SF563 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF347 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF347.html |