IA HF489 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 883.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefit managers and health carriers and management of prescription drug benefits, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefit managers and health carriers and management of prescription drug benefits, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 883. |
2019-04-16 | House | SF 563 substituted. H.J. 865. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1210 adopted. H.J. 865. |
2019-04-11 | House | Amendment H-1210 filed. H.J. 845. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 756. |
2019-03-28 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 381. |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 7:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-25 | House | Subcommittee: Best, Forbes and Lundgren. H.J. 353. |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 340. |
Same As/Similar To
SF347 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 563. S.J. 524.
SF563 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
SF563 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF489 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF489.html |