IA SF529 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to assisted reproduction fraud, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1223.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to assisted reproduction fraud, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1223.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Shall amendment H–1413, to the committee amendment H–1333, be adopted? (Y: 56 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-04HouseFiscal note.
2022-05-02HouseSenate amendment H-8369 filed. H.J. 870.
2022-05-02HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 867.
2022-05-02SenateImmediate message. S.J. 830.
2022-05-02SenatePassed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 828.
2022-05-02SenateSenate concurred with S-3175, as amended. S.J. 828.
2022-05-02SenateAmendment S-5146 to S-3175 filed, adopted. S.J. 828.
2021-12-31SenateEND OF [] ACTIONS
2021-05-04SenateFiscal note.
2021-04-28SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3175. S.J. 964.
2021-04-27HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1019.
2021-05-06HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1076.
2021-04-28HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1031.
2021-04-27HousePassed House, yeas 93 nays none. H.J. 1007.
2021-04-27HouseCommittee amendment H-1333 adopted, as amended. H.J. 1006.
2021-04-28HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1031.
2021-04-27HouseAmendment H-1413 to committee amendment H-1333 adopted. H.J. 1006.
2021-04-26HouseAmendment H-1413 filed. H.J. 1003.
2021-04-08HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 920.
2021-04-01HouseCommittee amendment H-1333 filed. H.J. 879.
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 878.
2021-03-29HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
2021-03-24HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2021 11:45AM House Lounge #1.
2021-03-23HouseSubcommittee: Jeneary, Andrews and Sunde. H.J. 830.
2021-03-22HouseRead first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 761.
2021-03-17HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 742.
2021-03-17SenateImmediate message. S.J. 632.
2021-03-17SenatePassed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 629.
2021-03-17SenateAmendment S-3079 filed, adopted. S.J. 629.
2021-03-09SenateFiscal note.
2021-03-03SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 512.
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 506.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1223 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 529.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF529
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF529.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGR/89/attachments/SF529.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1216131.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1220413.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1290508.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210303_SJNL.pdf#512
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210317_SJNL.pdf#629
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210427_HJNL.pdf#1006
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210427_HJNL.pdf#1007
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20220502_SJNL.pdf#828

Bill Comments

feedback