IA SSB1223 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF529

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 529.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to assisted reproduction fraud, and providing penalties.(See SF 529.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to assisted reproduction fraud, and providing penalties.(See SF 529.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 529.
2021-02-25SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 12:00PM 217 Conference Room.
2021-02-23SenateSubcommittee: Sweeney, Lofgren, and Trone Garriott.
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources.
2021-02-23SenateBy COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES

Same As/Similar To

SF529 (Replaced by) 2021-04-08 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 920.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback