IA SF528 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to persons eligible to hunt with a crossbow. (Formerly SF 383.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to persons eligible to hunt with a crossbow. (Formerly SF 383.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1066. |
2023-05-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1013. |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays 0. H.J. 986. |
2023-05-03 | House | Substituted for HF 538. H.J. 985. |
2023-04-25 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 908. |
2023-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 907. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 930. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 928. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 507. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 494. |
Same As/Similar To
SF383 (Similar To) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 528. S.J. 507.
HF449 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 538.
HF538 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1013.
HF449 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 538.
HF538 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1013.