IA HF449 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 538.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 538.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to persons eligible to hunt with a crossbow.(See HF 538.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to persons eligible to hunt with a crossbow.(See HF 538.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 538. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 447. |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 8:45AM House Lounge. |
2023-02-24 | House | Subcommittee: Thompson, M., Jacoby and Latham. H.J. 435. |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 426. |
Same As/Similar To
SF383 (Similar To) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 528. S.J. 507.
HF538 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1013.
SF528 (Similar To) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
HF538 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1013.
SF528 (Similar To) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF449 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF449.html |