IA SF383 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 528. S.J. 507.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 528. S.J. 507.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to persons eligible to hunt with a crossbow.(See SF 528.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to persons eligible to hunt with a crossbow.(See SF 528.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 528. S.J. 507. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2023 2:00PM Room 315. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Bennett, and Evans. S.J. 395. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 391. |
Same As/Similar To
HF449 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 538.
HF538 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1013.
SF528 (Similar To) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
HF538 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1013.
SF528 (Similar To) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF383 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF383.html |