IA SF523 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 832.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 832.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the services provided by the Iowa telecommunications and technology commission.(Formerly SSB 1209.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the services provided by the Iowa telecommunications and technology commission.(Formerly SSB 1209.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 832. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | HF 805 substituted. S.J. 831. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 726. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 805. S.J. 598. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 499. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 496. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1209 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 523.
HSB232 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 805.
HF805 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
HSB232 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 805.
HF805 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.