IA SSB1209 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF523
Note: Legislation replaced by HF805
Note: Legislation replaced by HF805
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 523.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 523.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the services provided by the Iowa telecommunications and technology commission.(See SF 523.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the services provided by the Iowa telecommunications and technology commission.(See SF 523.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 523. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 10:00AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Goodwin, Quirmbach, and Williams. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB232 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 805.
SF523 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 832.
HF805 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
SF523 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 832.
HF805 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1209 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1209.html |