IA SF370 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 554. S.J. 521.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 554. S.J. 521.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of certain pesticides, by providing for a fee increase, the establishment of a fund, and making appropriations. (See SF 554; SF 601.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of certain pesticides, by providing for a fee increase, the establishment of a fund, and making appropriations. (See SF 554; SF 601.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 554. S.J. 521. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kapucian, Rozenboom, and Wahls. S.J. 390. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 387. |
Same As/Similar To
SF554 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 601. S.J. 710.
SF601 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Fiscal note.
SF601 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF370 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF370.html |