IA SF601 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a pesticide administration and enforcement fund and making appropriations. (Formerly SF 370, SF 554.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a pesticide administration and enforcement fund and making appropriations. (Formerly SF 370, SF 554.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 470. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 11:00AM RM 315. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Bolkcom, and Shipley. S.J. 52. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1191. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 710. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 709. |
Same As/Similar To
SF370 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 554. S.J. 521.
SF554 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 601. S.J. 710.
SF554 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 601. S.J. 710.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF601 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF601.html |