IA SF361 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Labor. H.J. 965.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Labor. H.J. 965.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning private sector employee drug testing. (Formerly SSB 1055.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning private sector employee drug testing. (Formerly SSB 1055.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3077 be adopted? (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor And Business Relations Report (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3077 be adopted? (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor And Business Relations Report (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Labor. H.J. 965. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 760. |
2021-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 741. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 614. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 17. S.J. 612. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3077 filed, adopted. S.J. 611. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 349. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 345. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1055 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 361.
HSB248 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 748.
HF748 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Labor. H.J. 965.
HSB248 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 748.
HF748 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Labor. H.J. 965.