IA SSB1055 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF361
Note: Legislation replaced by HF748
Note: Legislation replaced by HF748
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 361.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 361.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning private sector employee drug testing.(See SF 361.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning private sector employee drug testing.(See SF 361.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 361. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2021 2:30PM RM 24A. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Dotzler, and Schultz. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Labor and Business Relations. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LABOR AND BUSINESS RELATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SF361 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Labor. H.J. 965.
HSB248 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 748.
HF748 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Labor. H.J. 965.
HSB248 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 748.
HF748 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Labor. H.J. 965.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1055 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1055.html |