IA SF342 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Clarification of enactment date. S.J. 1166.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to public records and communications in professional confidence; uniform commercial code filings; qualified immunity; peace officer health plans and workers' compensation; certain law enforcement matters; criminal laws involving public disorder, assaults, and harassment; civil liability for certain vehicle operators; window tinting; acts on certain highways; and civil service commission examinations; providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 6.) Effective date: Enactment, 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 01/01/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to public records and communications in professional confidence; uniform commercial code filings; qualified immunity; peace officer health plans and workers' compensation; certain law enforcement matters; criminal laws involving public disorder, assaults, and harassment; civil liability for certain vehicle operators; window tinting; acts on certain highways; and civil service commission examinations; providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 6.) Effective date: Enactment, 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 01/01/2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3208 to House amendment S–3158 be adopted? (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3202 to House amendment S–3158 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to immediately consider amendment H–1346, to amendment H–1342? (Y: 36 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01SenateClarification of enactment date. S.J. 1166.
2021-06-17SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 1150.
2021-06-03SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1149.
2021-05-18SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1109.
2021-05-18HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1170.
2021-10-05HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1222.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1206.
2021-05-19HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1200.
2021-05-18HousePassed House, yeas 56, nays 35. H.J. 1169.
2021-05-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-1497. H.J. 1169.
2021-05-17HouseSenate amendment H-1497 filed. H.J. 1140.
2021-05-17HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1117.
2021-05-17SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1063.
2021-06-22SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 1149.
2021-05-17SenatePassed Senate, yeas 27, nays 18. S.J. 1063.
2021-05-17SenateSenate concurred with S-3158, as amended. S.J. 1062.
2021-05-17SenateAmendments S-3167 and S-3207 out of order. S.J. 1062.
2021-05-17SenateAmendment S-3207 to S-3158 filed. S.J. 1062.
2021-05-17SenateAmendment S-3208 to S-3158 filed, adopted. S.J. 1061.
2021-05-17SenateAmendment S-3202 to S-3158 filed, lost. S.J. 1061.
2021-04-27SenateAmendment S-3167 to S-3158 filed. S.J. 962.
2021-04-19SenateFiscal note.
2021-04-15SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3158. S.J. 887.
2021-04-14HouseImmediate message. H.J. 961.
2021-05-18HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1173.
2021-04-22HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1000.
2021-04-21HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 996.
2021-04-14HousePassed House, yeas 63 nays 30. H.J. 960.
2021-04-14HouseAmendment H-1396 filed, ruled out of order. H.J. 959.
2021-04-14HouseAmendment H-1342 adopted, as amended. H.J. 959.
2021-04-14HouseAmendment H-1346 to amendment H-1342 out of order. H.J. 959.
2021-04-14HouseAmendment H-1343 to amendment H-1342 adopted. H.J. 959.
2021-04-14HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 959.
2021-05-18HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1173.
2021-04-21HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 996.
2021-04-14HousePoint of order raised to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1346 to amendment H-1342. H.J. 958.
2021-04-14HouseSubstituted for HF 698. H.J. 958.
2021-04-05HouseAmendments H-1343 and H-1346 filed. H.J. 884.
2021-04-02HouseAmendment H-1342 filed. H.J. 882.
2021-03-25HousePassed on file. H.J. 854.
2021-03-08HouseRead first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 644.
2021-03-08HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 642.
2021-03-08SenateImmediate message. S.J. 535.
2021-03-08SenatePassed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 535.
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 335.
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 328.

Same As/Similar To

SF6 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 342. S.J. 335.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF342
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF342.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/89/attachments/SF342.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1219256.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1219835.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210211_SJNL.pdf#335
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210308_SJNL.pdf#535
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210414_HJNL.pdf#959
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210414_HJNL.pdf#958
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210517_SJNL.pdf#1061
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210517_SJNL.pdf#1062
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210517_SJNL.pdf#1063
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210518_HJNL.pdf#1167
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210518_HJNL.pdf#1169

Bill Comments

feedback