IA SF2292 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to regulation of vessels and equipment on public lakes by common interest communities and certain nonprofit corporations.(Formerly SSB 3153.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to regulation of vessels and equipment on public lakes by common interest communities and certain nonprofit corporations.(Formerly SSB 3153.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 397. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | HF 2485 substituted. S.J. 396. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Amendment S-5024 filed, adopted. S.J. 396. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Attached to HF 2485. S.J. 370. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 255. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 251. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB647 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2485.
SSB3153 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2292.
HF2485 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 450.
SSB3153 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2292.
HF2485 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 450.