IA HF2485 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 450.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 450.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to regulation of watercraft and equipment on public lakes by common interest communities and certain nonprofit corporations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 647.) Effective date: 02/28/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to regulation of watercraft and equipment on public lakes by common interest communities and certain nonprofit corporations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 647.) Effective date: 02/28/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 450. |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 450. |
2024-02-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 401. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 398. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 5. S.J. 396. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2292. S.J. 396. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2292. S.J. 370. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 370. |
2024-02-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 360. |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House, yeas 74, nays 22. H.J. 347. |
2024-02-21 | House | Amendment H-8009 adopted. H.J. 347. |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment H-8009 filed. H.J. 287. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 253. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB647 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2485.
SSB3153 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2292.
SF2292 (Similar To) 2024-02-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 397.
SSB3153 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2292.
SF2292 (Similar To) 2024-02-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 397.