IA SF2231 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the penalties for defendants who aid and abet the commission of murder in the first degree.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the penalties for defendants who aid and abet the commission of murder in the first degree.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 3:00PM RM 315. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, R. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 290. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 272. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2231 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2231.html |