IA SF2120 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including information collection and reporting requirements under the Iowa prescription monitoring program. (Formerly SSB 3051.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including information collection and reporting requirements under the Iowa prescription monitoring program. (Formerly SSB 3051.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 658. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 658. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 610. |
2020-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 587. |
2020-03-12 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 592. |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 576. |
2020-03-11 | House | Substituted for HF 2218. H.J. 575. |
2020-02-11 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 238. |
2020-02-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 227. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 253. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 253. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 189. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 184. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3051 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Reported out of committee as SF 2120.
HSB532 (Related) 2020-01-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 166.
HF2218 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 587.
HSB532 (Related) 2020-01-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 166.
HF2218 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 587.