IA SF2078 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to voter registration, including verification of voter citizenship.
Title
A bill for an act relating to voter registration, including verification of voter citizenship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 338. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2024 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Salmon, Weiner, and Westrich. S.J. 277. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Salmon, and Weiner. S.J. 139. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 130. |