IA SF2077 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee: Reichman, Lofgren, and Wahls. S.J. 169.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Subcommittee: Reichman, Lofgren, and Wahls. S.J. 169.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act making an appropriation to support efforts relating to commissioning the U.S.S. Iowa SSN 797, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act making an appropriation to support efforts relating to commissioning the U.S.S. Iowa SSN 797, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee: Reichman, Lofgren, and Wahls. S.J. 169. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 130. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB657 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2525.
HF2525 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2640.
HF2640 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - NOBA: House Full Approps
HF2525 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2640.
HF2640 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - NOBA: House Full Approps
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2077 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2077.html |