IA SF2049 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2022 8:00AM Room 217 Conference Room.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2022 8:00AM Room 217 Conference Room.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to affirmative defenses for entities using cybersecurity programs and electronic transactions recorded by blockchain technology.
Title
A bill for an act relating to affirmative defenses for entities using cybersecurity programs and electronic transactions recorded by blockchain technology.
Sponsors
Sen. Zach Nunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2022 8:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Nunn, Mathis, and Williams. S.J. 121. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 106. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB555 (Related) 2022-02-03 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 185.
HF2302 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 620.
HF2302 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 620.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2049 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2049.html |