IA SF2034 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2346. S.J. 292.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2346. S.J. 292.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating an excuse from jury service for persons who are eighteen years of age and enrolled in high school classes.(See SF 2346.)
Title
A bill for an act creating an excuse from jury service for persons who are eighteen years of age and enrolled in high school classes.(See SF 2346.)
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2346. S.J. 292. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 11:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Evans, and Quirmbach. S.J. 120. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 60. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2346 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Amendment S-5045 filed. S.J. 454.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2034 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2034.html |