IA SF186 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1031.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1031.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act to increase the maximum capacity of certain motor vehicles operated by school district employees to transport children to activity events or from school to home in unusual situations. (Formerly SF 43.)
Title
A bill for an act to increase the maximum capacity of certain motor vehicles operated by school district employees to transport children to activity events or from school to home in unusual situations. (Formerly SF 43.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1031. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | HF 499 substituted. S.J. 1030. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3192 filed, adopted. S.J. 1030. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 499. S.J. 730. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 237. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 228. |
Same As/Similar To
SF43 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 186. S.J. 237.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF186 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF186.html |