IA SF43 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 186. S.J. 237.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 186. S.J. 237.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act to increase the maximum capacity of certain motor vehicles operated by school district employees to transport children to activity events or from school to home in unusual situations. (See SF 186.)
Title
A bill for an act to increase the maximum capacity of certain motor vehicles operated by school district employees to transport children to activity events or from school to home in unusual situations. (See SF 186.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 186. S.J. 237. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Breitbach, Kinney, and Koelker. S.J. 158. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 87. |
Same As/Similar To
SF186 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1031.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF43 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF43.html |