IA SF173 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 358. S.J. 397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 358. S.J. 397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to taking certain animals that are deemed a nuisance.(See SF 358.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to taking certain animals that are deemed a nuisance.(See SF 358.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 358. S.J. 397. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2023 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Bennett, and Zumbach. S.J. 275. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 207. |
Same As/Similar To
HF118 (Similar To) 2023-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 539.
HF317 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.
SF358 (Similar To) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 811.
HF317 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.
SF358 (Similar To) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 811.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF173 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF173.html |