IA HSB71 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF123
Note: Legislation replaced by HF205
Note: Legislation replaced by HF205
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the distribution of certain barrel tax revenues collected on beer.(See HF 205.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the distribution of certain barrel tax revenues collected on beer.(See HF 205.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 205. |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 232. |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2023 1:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2023-01-20 | House | Subcommittee: Sexton, Best and Forbes. H.J. 133. |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 132. |
2023-01-20 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB71 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB71.html |