IA HF205 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the distribution of certain barrel tax revenues collected on beer. (Formerly HSB 71.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the distribution of certain barrel tax revenues collected on beer. (Formerly HSB 71.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12HouseFiscal note.
2023-03-22HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 732.
2023-03-22HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 726.
2023-03-07HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 512.
2023-03-07SenateImmediate message. S.J. 512.
2023-03-07SenatePassed Senate, yeas 47, nays 2. S.J. 511.
2023-03-07SenateSubstituted for SF 123. S.J. 511.
2023-02-16SenateRead first time, attached to SF 123. S.J. 347.
2023-02-16SenateMessage from House. S.J. 347.
2023-02-15HouseImmediate message. H.J. 351.
2023-02-15HousePassed House, yeas 98, nays 0. H.J. 316.
2023-02-13HouseFiscal note.
2023-02-06HouseIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 247.

Same As/Similar To

HSB71 (Related) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 205.
SF123 (Similar To) 2023-03-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 512.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback