IA HSB654 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2549
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to health insurance by certain peace officers of the department of public safety.
Title
A bill for an act relating to health insurance by certain peace officers of the department of public safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 329. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 8:00AM RM 308. |
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Thorup, Worthan and Breckenridge. H.J. 208. |
2020-02-06 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2549 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Amendments H-8149, H-8156 and H-8157 filed. H.J. 590.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB654 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB654.html |