IA HSB612 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2109
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2463
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2463
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2463.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2463.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the driving privileges of persons under eighteen years of age, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 2463.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the driving privileges of persons under eighteen years of age, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 2463.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2463. |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 235. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 12:00PM RM 19. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Henderson and Madison. H.J. 133. |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 130. |
2024-01-24 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3097 (Related) 2024-01-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2109.
SF2109 (Replaced by) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.
HF2463 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 771.
SF2109 (Replaced by) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.
HF2463 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 771.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB612 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB612.html |