IA HF2463 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 771.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 771.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the driving privileges of persons under eighteen years of age, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HSB 612.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the driving privileges of persons under eighteen years of age, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HSB 612.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 771. |
2024-04-10 | House | SF 2109 substituted. H.J. 768. |
2024-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8274 adopted. H.J. 768. |
2024-04-03 | House | Amendment H-8274 filed. H.J. 732. |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587. |
2024-02-29 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 243. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3097 (Related) 2024-01-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2109.
HSB612 (Related) 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2463.
SF2109 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.
HSB612 (Related) 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2463.
SF2109 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.