IA SF2109 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the driving privileges of persons under eighteen years of age, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3097.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the driving privileges of persons under eighteen years of age, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3097.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 962. |
2024-05-08 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 961. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 959. |
2024-04-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 924. |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 56, nays 35. H.J. 913. |
2024-04-19 | House | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 913. |
2024-04-19 | House | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 912. |
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 907. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 935. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 14. S.J. 935. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report filed, adopted. S.J. 934. |
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 875. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed: Dickey, chair; Bisignano, Cournoyer, Dotzler, and Klimesh. S.J. 899. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 898. |
2024-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 869. |
2024-04-18 | House | House conference committee appointed: Siegrist, Chair; Best, Henderson, Bagniewski and Meyer, B.. H.J. 856. |
2024-04-18 | House | House insisted. H.J. 856. |
2024-04-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 820. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 852. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate refused to concur with S-5152. S.J. 851. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5152. S.J. 804. |
2024-04-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 771. |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 63, nays 34. H.J. 769. |
2024-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8275 adopted, as amended. H.J. 769. |
2024-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8302 to amendment H-8275 filed, adopted. H.J. 769. |
2024-04-10 | House | Substituted for HF 2463. H.J. 768. |
2024-04-03 | House | Amendment H-8275 filed. H.J. 732. |
2024-04-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 685. |
2024-03-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 683. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 645. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 15. S.J. 644. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5097 adopted, as amended. S.J. 644. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5103 to S-5097 filed, adopted. S.J. 644. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5097 filed. S.J. 644. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 155. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 148. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3097 (Related) 2024-01-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2109.
HSB612 (Related) 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2463.
HF2463 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 771.
HSB612 (Related) 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2463.
HF2463 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 771.