IA HSB595 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2322
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2554
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2554
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating the offense of continuous sexual abuse of a child and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act creating the offense of continuous sexual abuse of a child and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 322. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Paustian and Olson. H.J. 165. |
2020-01-29 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3064 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2322.
SF2322 (Replaced by) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 639.
HF2554 (Replaced by) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
SF2322 (Replaced by) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 639.
HF2554 (Replaced by) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB595 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB595.html |