IA SF2322 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 639.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 639.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating the offense of continuous sexual abuse of a child and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3064.)
Title
A bill for an act creating the offense of continuous sexual abuse of a child and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3064.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 639. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | HF 2554 substituted. S.J. 638. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Amendment S-5090 filed, adopted. S.J. 638. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 2554. S.J. 611. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 359. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 351. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3064 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2322.
HSB595 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 322.
HF2554 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
HSB595 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 322.
HF2554 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2322 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2322.html |