IA HSB585 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 174.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 174.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying the earliest possible start date of the school calendar for school districts and accredited nonpublic schools.
Title
A bill for an act modifying the earliest possible start date of the school calendar for school districts and accredited nonpublic schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 174. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Johnson, Buck and Gehlbach. H.J. 111. |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 108. |
2024-01-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB585 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB585.html |