IA HSB551 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2202
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2308
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2308
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2308.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2308.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a proclamation of disaster emergency and the disaster aid contingent fund.(See HF 2308.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to a proclamation of disaster emergency and the disaster aid contingent fund.(See HF 2308.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2308. |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 174. |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 12:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2024 12:00PM House Lounge (Cancelled). |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee: Fisher, Henderson and Kurth. H.J. 73. |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 70. |
2024-01-10 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3062 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2202.
SF2202 (Replaced by) 2024-04-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 732.
HF2308 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
SF2202 (Replaced by) 2024-04-03 - Withdrawn. S.J. 732.
HF2308 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB551 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB551.html |